U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Arizona

arizona Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Arizona
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:24-cv-03394
  • Case Name: McGhee v. J.E.T. Limousines & Transportation LLC et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 13, 2025: [Notice of Errata]
  • May 09, 2025: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • May 09, 2025: [Response to Motion]
  • May 09, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • May 08, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • May 07, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • May 07, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • May 06, 2025: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief ]
  • May 01, 2025: [Order]
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • April 28, 2025: [Notice of Errata]
  • April 25, 2025: [Certify Class]
  • April 25, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 25, 2025: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • April 22, 2025: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • April 18, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • April 10, 2025: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • April 10, 2025: [Notice of Service of Discovery]
  • April 10, 2025: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • April 08, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • April 08, 2025: [Service Executed]
  • April 07, 2025: [Declaration]
  • April 07, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 01, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Summons Issued]
  • March 28, 2025: [Summons Submitted]
  • March 28, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • March 28, 2025: [Amended Complaint]
  • March 28, 2025: [Notice of Filing - Amended Pleading (LRCiv 15.1(b))]
  • March 26, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • March 26, 2025: [Disclosure Statement]
  • March 26, 2025: [Order]
  • March 25, 2025: [Scheduling Order]
  • March 25, 2025: [Scheduling Conference]
  • March 25, 2025: [1 - Common Prompts (Text Only)]
  • March 21, 2025: [Order on Motion for Leave to Appear ]
  • March 20, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • March 19, 2025: [Appear]
  • March 18, 2025: [Order on Stipulation]
  • March 18, 2025: [Notice of Appearance/Association of Counsel]
  • March 17, 2025: [Report - Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting (Proposed Case Mgt Plan)]
  • March 17, 2025: [Notice of Service of Discovery]
  • March 17, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • March 14, 2025: [Stipulation]
  • March 14, 2025: [Protective Order]
  • March 13, 2025: [Protective Order]
  • March 11, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • March 10, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
December, 2024
  • December 09, 2024: [Service Executed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.