U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Arizona

arizona Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Arizona
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:23-cv-00054
  • Case Name: Prosisat SA de CV v. FAMA Energy Resources LLC
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 25, 2025: [Writ Issued]
  • April 25, 2025: [Application for Writ]
  • April 24, 2025: [Petition ]
  • April 24, 2025: [Application for Writ]
  • April 23, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 22, 2025: [Answer to Writ of Garnishment]
March, 2025
  • March 20, 2025: [Service Executed]
  • March 19, 2025: [Answer to Writ of Garnishment]
  • March 11, 2025: [Writ Issued]
  • March 10, 2025: [Application for Writ]
December, 2024
  • December 12, 2024: [Notice (Other)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.