U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Arizona

arizona Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Arizona
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:24-cv-03159
  • Case Name: Miller v. Cenlar FSB et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 08, 2025: [Notice of Service of Discovery]
  • May 07, 2025: [Notice of Service of Discovery]
  • May 01, 2025: [Remark re Pro Hac Vice Motion]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Notice of Service of Discovery]
  • April 25, 2025: [Notice of Appearance/Association of Counsel]
  • April 04, 2025: [Notice of Service of Discovery]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Notice of Service of Discovery]
  • March 27, 2025: [Notice of Service of Discovery]
  • March 24, 2025: [Notice of Service of Discovery]
  • March 11, 2025: [Protective Order]
  • March 10, 2025: [Protective Order]
December, 2024
  • December 19, 2024: [Notice of Change of Address/Email/Firm Name (Attorney)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.