U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Arizona

arizona Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Arizona
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:23-cv-02540
  • Case Name: Dugan v. Charles Schwab & Company Incorporated
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 13, 2025: [Protective Order]
April, 2025
  • April 28, 2025: [Notice of Service of Discovery]
  • April 24, 2025: [Discovery Hearing ]
  • April 24, 2025: [1 - Common Prompts (Text Only)]
  • April 23, 2025: [Notice of Service of Discovery]
  • April 23, 2025: [Order on Motion for Hearing]
  • April 22, 2025: [Hearing]
  • April 08, 2025: [Order]
  • April 08, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • April 08, 2025: [~Util - Terminate Motions ]
  • April 07, 2025: [Notice of Service of Discovery]
  • April 01, 2025: [Notice of Service of Discovery]
March, 2025
  • March 25, 2025: [Notice of Deposition]
  • March 17, 2025: [Notice of Service of Discovery]
  • March 14, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery]
  • March 14, 2025: [Withdrawal of Document]
  • March 14, 2025: [Extension of Time to Complete Discovery]
  • March 14, 2025: [Discovery]
  • March 12, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • March 12, 2025: [Extension of Time to Complete Discovery]
  • March 11, 2025: [Notice of Service of Discovery]
  • March 11, 2025: [Notice of Deposition]
December, 2024
  • December 20, 2024: [Notice of Service of Discovery]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.