U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Arizona

arizona Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Arizona
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:24-cv-02340
  • Case Name: Canfield v. Commissioner of Social Security Administration
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 13, 2025: [Order on Motion for Attorney Fees ]
  • May 03, 2025: [Attorney Fees]
April, 2025
  • April 17, 2025: [Clerks Judgment]
  • April 17, 2025: [Order on Stipulation]
  • April 15, 2025: [Stipulation]
  • April 09, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Document]
  • April 07, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Document]
March, 2025
  • March 14, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance/Substitution - USA]
December, 2024
  • December 29, 2024: [Extension of Time]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.