U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Arizona

arizona Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Arizona
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:23-cv-00307
  • Case Name: Biltform Architecture Group of Companies LLC v. HCW LLC et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 21, 2025: [~Util - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • April 21, 2025: [Order]
  • April 21, 2025: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • April 21, 2025: [Notice of Settlement]
  • April 11, 2025: [Disclosure Statement]
  • April 10, 2025: [Notice of Deposition]
  • April 07, 2025: [Notice of Deficiency re Disclosure Statement]
  • April 04, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Notice of Deposition]
  • March 21, 2025: [Notice of Service of Discovery]
  • March 19, 2025: [Order on Stipulation]
  • March 18, 2025: [Stipulation]
  • March 18, 2025: [Notice of Deposition]
January, 2025
  • January 09, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.