U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Arizona

arizona Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Arizona
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:24-cv-03209
  • Case Name: Ellis v. Sellers et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 05, 2025: [Notice of Service of Discovery]
April, 2025
  • April 22, 2025: [Notice of Service of Discovery]
  • April 16, 2025: [Notice of Service of Discovery]
March, 2025
  • March 28, 2025: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • March 27, 2025: [Notice of Service of Discovery]
  • March 19, 2025: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • March 17, 2025: [Notice of Service of Discovery]
  • March 13, 2025: [Order on Stipulation]
  • March 11, 2025: [Stipulation]
January, 2025
  • January 10, 2025: [Order on Stipulation]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.