U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Arizona

arizona Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Arizona
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:23-cv-02285
  • Case Name: Eisenmann #089804 v. Thornell et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 23, 2025: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • April 22, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • April 21, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • April 16, 2025: [Order]
  • April 14, 2025: [Response to Motion]
  • April 11, 2025: [Notice of Change of Address (Party)]
  • April 08, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief]
January, 2025
  • January 13, 2025: [Reply to Objection to Report and Recommendation]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.