U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Arizona

arizona Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Arizona
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:23-cv-00729
  • Case Name: Jauregui v. Daimler Truck North America LLC et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 25, 2025: [USCA Case Number]
  • April 22, 2025: [Notice of Appeal]
  • April 08, 2025: [Bill of Costs]
  • April 07, 2025: [Bill of Costs]
March, 2025
  • March 25, 2025: [Clerks Judgment]
  • March 25, 2025: [Order on Motion for Partial Summary Judgment ]
  • March 25, 2025: [Order on Motion for Summary Judgment ]
  • March 25, 2025: [Order on Motion in Limine ]
  • March 25, 2025: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief ]
  • March 21, 2025: [Objection]
  • March 21, 2025: [Reply]
  • March 21, 2025: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • March 18, 2025: [Order on Stipulation]
  • March 17, 2025: [Stipulation]
January, 2025
  • January 13, 2025: [Joinder]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.