U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Arizona

arizona Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Arizona
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:24-cv-00995
  • Case Name: Andrews v. Wilson Electric Services Corporation et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 09, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • May 07, 2025: [Remark re Pro Hac Vice Motion]
  • May 02, 2025: [Reply to Response to Motion]
April, 2025
  • April 28, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time ]
  • April 28, 2025: [Extension of Time]
  • April 25, 2025: [Declaration]
  • April 25, 2025: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • April 11, 2025: [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
March, 2025
  • March 21, 2025: [Amended Complaint]
  • March 21, 2025: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct ]
  • March 21, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
  • March 20, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • March 20, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • March 20, 2025: [Memorandum ]
  • March 20, 2025: [Amend/Correct]
  • March 19, 2025: [Notice of Service of Discovery]
  • March 18, 2025: [Sealed Document]
  • March 18, 2025: [Order on Motion to Seal Document ]
January, 2025
  • January 16, 2025: [Reply to Response to Motion]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.