U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Arizona

arizona Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Arizona
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:24-cv-03437
  • Case Name: Legalforce RAPC Worldwide PC et al v. United States Patent and Trademark Office et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 05, 2025: [Order]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Declaration]
  • April 29, 2025: [Amend/Correct]
  • April 29, 2025: [Reconsideration]
  • April 29, 2025: [Clerks Judgment]
  • April 29, 2025: [Reply]
  • April 29, 2025: [Order on Motion for Leave to File ]
  • April 29, 2025: [Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction ]
  • April 29, 2025: [Order on Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction]
  • April 28, 2025: [Lodged Proposed Document]
  • April 28, 2025: [Leave to File Document]
  • April 25, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 25, 2025: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • April 15, 2025: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages ]
  • April 15, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • April 15, 2025: [Memorandum ]
  • April 15, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 14, 2025: [Response to Motion]
  • April 11, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • March 31, 2025: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • March 26, 2025: [File Excess Pages]
  • March 26, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
  • March 26, 2025: [Order on Motion for Ruling ]
  • March 26, 2025: [Order on Motion for Default Judgment ]
  • March 24, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • March 24, 2025: [Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction]
  • March 21, 2025: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • March 13, 2025: [Notice of Errata]
  • March 13, 2025: [Default Judgment]
  • March 13, 2025: [Ruling]
  • March 13, 2025: [Dismiss/Lack of Prosecution]
January, 2025
  • January 18, 2025: [Service Executed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.