U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Arizona

arizona Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Arizona
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:24-cv-03184
  • Case Name: Trischan v. Suns Legacy Partners LLC
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 08, 2025: [Response to Motion]
April, 2025
  • April 24, 2025: [Protective Order]
  • April 10, 2025: [Notice of Service of Discovery]
  • April 09, 2025: [Notice of Service of Discovery]
March, 2025
  • March 10, 2025: [Notice of Service of Discovery]
January, 2025
  • January 31, 2025: [Reply to Response to Motion]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.