U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Arizona

arizona Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Arizona
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:24-cv-00519
  • Case Name: Rogers v. RTX Corporation
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 15, 2025: [Order on Motion to Stay]
  • April 15, 2025: [Order on Motion to Strike ]
  • April 10, 2025: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • April 04, 2025: [Response to Motion]
  • April 04, 2025: [Objection]
  • April 04, 2025: [Strike]
March, 2025
  • March 25, 2025: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • March 25, 2025: [Notice of Errata]
  • March 18, 2025: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
February, 2025
  • February 02, 2025: [Service Executed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.