U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Arizona

arizona Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Arizona
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:25-cv-00130
  • Case Name: Martinez v. Duarte et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 15, 2025: [Order]
  • April 15, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • April 15, 2025: [Continue]
  • April 03, 2025: [Appear]
  • April 02, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 02, 2025: [Order]
  • April 02, 2025: [~Util - Terminate Hearings]
  • April 02, 2025: [~Util - Terminate Motions ]
  • April 01, 2025: [Vacate]
March, 2025
  • March 26, 2025: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • March 20, 2025: [Joinder of Additional Parties]
  • March 19, 2025: [Response to Motion]
  • March 19, 2025: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
February, 2025
  • February 13, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.