U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Arizona

arizona Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Arizona
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:24-cv-08031
  • Case Name: Seredina v. W.L. Gore & Associates Incorporated et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 09, 2025: [Notice of Service of Discovery]
  • May 08, 2025: [Notice of Deposition]
  • May 07, 2025: [Amend/Correct]
  • May 07, 2025: [Notice of Service of Discovery]
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: [Notice of Service of Discovery]
  • April 10, 2025: [Amended Doc (NOT Motion/Complaint/Cross/Counter/3rd Party Claim)]
  • April 10, 2025: [Sealed Document]
  • April 10, 2025: [Order on Motion to Seal Document ]
  • April 01, 2025: [Notice of Errata]
March, 2025
  • March 21, 2025: [Notice of Service of Discovery]
  • March 20, 2025: [Notice of Service of Discovery]
  • March 14, 2025: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • March 12, 2025: [Reply to Response to Motion]
February, 2025
  • February 23, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.