U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Arizona

arizona Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Arizona
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:23-cv-01788
  • Case Name: Ramirez et al v. Drug Enforcement Administration et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • April 25, 2025: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
  • April 07, 2025: [Order on Motion to Vacate]
  • April 01, 2025: [Order]
  • April 01, 2025: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
March, 2025
  • March 25, 2025: [Notice of Settlement]
February, 2025
  • February 24, 2025: [Report - Status]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.