U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Arizona

arizona Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Arizona
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:25-cv-00461
  • Case Name: Evolution Nutraceuticals Incorporated v. ThermoLife International LLC
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 08, 2025: [Remark re Pro Hac Vice Motion]
April, 2025
  • April 28, 2025: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages ]
  • April 26, 2025: [Lodged Proposed Document]
  • April 26, 2025: [File Excess Pages]
  • April 22, 2025: [Disclosure Statement]
  • April 10, 2025: [Order on Stipulation]
  • April 10, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 10, 2025: [Notice of Deficiency re Disclosure Statement]
  • April 09, 2025: [Stipulation]
  • April 02, 2025: [Notice of Appearance/Association of Counsel]
February, 2025
  • February 26, 2025: [Service Executed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.