U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Arizona

arizona Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Arizona
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:24-cv-03653
  • Case Name: Taylor v. Alaska Airlines Incorporated
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 18, 2025: [Order]
  • April 15, 2025: [Additional Attachments to Main Document]
  • April 15, 2025: [Affidavit]
  • April 09, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • April 08, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • April 07, 2025: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct ]
  • April 05, 2025: [Amend/Correct]
  • April 04, 2025: [Order on Motion to Strike ]
  • April 03, 2025: [Strike]
March, 2025
  • March 28, 2025: [Order on Motion for Disclosure ]
  • March 28, 2025: [25 Pct Mag - Agreement to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction]
  • March 28, 2025: [25 Pct Mag - Text Order: Consent to Proceed before Mag Judge]
  • March 25, 2025: [Disclosure Statement]
  • March 22, 2025: [Amended Complaint]
  • March 21, 2025: [Order]
  • March 21, 2025: [Amended Complaint]
  • March 19, 2025: [Response to Motion]
  • March 12, 2025: [Order]
  • March 12, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • March 11, 2025: [Additional Attachments to Main Document]
  • March 11, 2025: [Declaration]
  • March 11, 2025: [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
February, 2025
  • February 28, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.