U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Arizona

arizona Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Arizona
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:24-cv-00366
  • Case Name: Crews v. First Family Insurance LLC et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 08, 2025: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • April 01, 2025: [Response to Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction]
  • April 01, 2025: [Affidavit]
  • April 01, 2025: [Response to Motion]
March, 2025
  • March 20, 2025: [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • March 20, 2025: [Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction]
  • March 20, 2025: [Remark re Pro Hac Vice Motion]
  • March 10, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
  • March 10, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • March 10, 2025: [Notice of Appearance/Association of Counsel]
  • March 01, 2025: [Lodged Proposed Document]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.