U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Arizona

arizona Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Arizona
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:24-cv-02911
  • Case Name: Uwamahoro v. Navistar Incorporated et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 01, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: [Notice of Service of Discovery]
  • April 23, 2025: [Report - Other]
  • April 08, 2025: [Order on Motion to Substitute Attorney]
  • April 04, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance/Substitution - USA]
  • April 02, 2025: [Notice of Service of Discovery]
March, 2025
  • March 25, 2025: [Notice of Appearance/Association of Counsel]
  • March 03, 2025: [Notice of Service of Discovery]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.