U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Arizona

arizona Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Arizona
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:24-cv-03456
  • Case Name: Johnson v. Peoria Unified School District et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 21, 2025: [Service Executed]
  • April 21, 2025: [Order]
  • April 21, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 17, 2025: [Joinder]
  • April 11, 2025: [Demand for Jury Trial by Defendant]
  • April 11, 2025: [Answer to Complaint]
  • April 09, 2025: [Service Executed]
  • April 09, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time ]
  • April 09, 2025: [Notice of Voluntary Dismissal - Party Only (Not Entire Case)]
  • April 08, 2025: [Extension of Time]
  • April 08, 2025: [Notice of Voluntary Dismissal - Party Only (Not Entire Case)]
  • April 01, 2025: [Order]
  • April 01, 2025: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • April 01, 2025: [Order re Rule 12(b) Motions]
  • April 01, 2025: [Minute Order]
  • April 01, 2025: [~Util - Add and Terminate Judges]
  • April 01, 2025: [~Util - Terminate Hearings]
  • April 01, 2025: [25 Pct Mag - Election to Assign Case to District Judge]
March, 2025
  • March 24, 2025: [25 Pct Mag - Order to Show Cause (LRCiv 3.7(b))]
  • March 18, 2025: [Order on Stipulation]
  • March 13, 2025: [Stipulation For Extension of Time To Answer Complaint]
  • March 12, 2025: [25 Pct Mag - Magistrate Election Form Deadline ]
  • March 11, 2025: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • March 11, 2025: [Service Executed]
  • March 09, 2025: [Service Executed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.