U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Arizona

arizona Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Arizona
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:25-cv-00550
  • Case Name: Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Arizona Incorporated et al v. Change Healthcare Practice Management Solutions Incorporated et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 25, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • April 22, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • April 21, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • April 21, 2025: [Extension of Time]
  • April 18, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 14, 2025: [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
March, 2025
  • March 28, 2025: [Order on Motion to Stay]
  • March 28, 2025: [Remark re Pro Hac Vice Motion]
  • March 26, 2025: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • March 25, 2025: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • March 21, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • March 21, 2025: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • March 21, 2025: [Order]
  • March 21, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • March 20, 2025: [Stay]
  • March 11, 2025: [Order on Stipulation]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.