U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Arizona

arizona Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Arizona
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:25-cv-00011
  • Case Name: Pulte Home Company LLC et al v. Allied World Assurance Company (US) Incorporated et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Report - Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting (Proposed Case Mgt Plan)]
  • April 30, 2025: [Disclosure Statement]
  • April 30, 2025: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • April 29, 2025: [Extension of Time]
  • April 28, 2025: [Notice of Voluntary Dismissal - Party Only (Not Entire Case)]
  • April 25, 2025: [Notice of Voluntary Dismissal - Party Only (Not Entire Case)]
  • April 25, 2025: [Notice of Appearance/Association of Counsel]
  • April 22, 2025: [Service Executed]
  • April 02, 2025: [Order]
  • April 02, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 01, 2025: [Disclosure Statement]
  • April 01, 2025: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
March, 2025
  • March 28, 2025: [Notice of Appearance/Association of Counsel]
  • March 28, 2025: [Demand for Jury Trial by Defendant]
  • March 28, 2025: [Disclosure Statement]
  • March 28, 2025: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • March 28, 2025: [Summons Issued]
  • March 27, 2025: [Exhibit List]
  • March 27, 2025: [Third Party Complaint ]
  • March 27, 2025: [Disclosure Statement]
  • March 27, 2025: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • March 25, 2025: [Service Executed]
  • March 19, 2025: [Notice of Deficiency re Disclosure Statement]
  • March 19, 2025: [Summons Issued]
  • March 18, 2025: [Summons Submitted]
  • March 17, 2025: [Third Party Complaint ]
  • March 17, 2025: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • March 14, 2025: [Summons Issued]
  • March 13, 2025: [Summons Submitted]
  • March 13, 2025: [Amended Complaint]
  • March 13, 2025: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct ]
  • March 11, 2025: [Disclosure Statement]
  • March 11, 2025: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.