U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Arizona

arizona Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Arizona
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:24-cv-00714
  • Case Name: Honicky #333893 v. Thornell et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Notice of Appeal - Amended]
  • April 29, 2025: [Notice of Appeal]
  • April 23, 2025: [Letter ]
  • April 11, 2025: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct ]
  • April 08, 2025: [Amend/Correct]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Clerks Judgment]
  • March 31, 2025: [Order Adopting Report and Recommendation]
  • March 27, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 20, 2025: [Strike]
  • March 19, 2025: [Reply]
  • March 11, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • March 11, 2025: [Reply to Response to Motion]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.