U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Arizona

arizona Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Arizona
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:24-cv-03558
  • Case Name: MiMedx Group Incorporated v. Surgenex LLC
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 28, 2025: [Notice of Service of Discovery]
  • April 21, 2025: [Notice of Service of Discovery]
  • April 07, 2025: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 07, 2025: [Scheduling Conference]
  • April 07, 2025: [1 - Common Prompts (Text Only)]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Report - Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting (Proposed Case Mgt Plan)]
  • March 28, 2025: [Notice of Service of Discovery]
  • March 25, 2025: [Remark (Public) ]
  • March 17, 2025: [Notice of Filing - Copyright, Trademark or Patent Information]
  • March 12, 2025: [Minute Order]
  • March 12, 2025: [~Util - Supplemental Request for Copyright, Trademark, or Patent Information]
  • March 12, 2025: [Notice of Deficiency (Text Only)]
  • March 11, 2025: [Answer to Counterclaim ]
  • March 11, 2025: [Counterclaim ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.