U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Arizona

arizona Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Arizona
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:24-cv-03654
  • Case Name: Yount v. Board of Nonlawyer Legal Service Providers et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 01, 2025: [Report and Recommendation]
April, 2025
  • April 02, 2025: [Reply to Response to Motion]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • March 27, 2025: [Order to Show Cause ]
  • March 27, 2025: [Response to Motion]
  • March 26, 2025: [Response to Motion]
  • March 25, 2025: [Minute Order]
  • March 25, 2025: [~Util - Terminate Hearings]
  • March 25, 2025: [25 Pct Mag - Agreement to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction]
  • March 24, 2025: [25 Pct Mag - Order to Show Cause (LRCiv 3.7(b))]
  • March 21, 2025: [Leave to File Document]
  • March 14, 2025: [Order]
  • March 13, 2025: [Response]
  • March 11, 2025: [Order]
  • March 11, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.