U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Arizona

arizona Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Arizona
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:24-cv-00155
  • Case Name: Vitasek #269436 v. GEO Group Incorporated et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: [Response to Motion]
  • April 28, 2025: [Withdraw]
  • April 28, 2025: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • April 24, 2025: [Response to Motion]
  • April 23, 2025: [Strike]
  • April 22, 2025: [Notice of Service of Discovery]
  • April 22, 2025: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • April 18, 2025: [Notice of Service of Discovery]
  • April 18, 2025: [Entry of Default]
  • April 16, 2025: [Response to Motion]
  • April 16, 2025: [Notice of Service of Discovery]
  • April 15, 2025: [Entry of Default]
  • April 15, 2025: [Compel]
  • April 14, 2025: [Response to Motion]
  • April 11, 2025: [Notice of Service of Discovery]
  • April 07, 2025: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • April 02, 2025: [Response to Motion]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Compel]
  • March 25, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • March 19, 2025: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief ]
  • March 18, 2025: [Additional Attachments to Main Document]
  • March 18, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 14, 2025: [Service Executed]
  • March 11, 2025: [Notice of Service of Discovery]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.