U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Arizona

arizona Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Arizona
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:25-cv-00745
  • Case Name: Wilson v. Consumer Cellular Incorporated
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 24, 2025: [Disclosure Statement]
  • April 18, 2025: [Order]
  • April 18, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 18, 2025: [Notice of Deficiency re Disclosure Statement]
  • April 17, 2025: [Answer to Complaint]
March, 2025
  • March 26, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
  • March 25, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • March 24, 2025: [Notice of Appearance/Association of Counsel]
  • March 11, 2025: [Service Executed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.