U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Arizona

arizona Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Arizona
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:25-cv-00809
  • Case Name: Cui et al v. Agua Fria Senior Living LP et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 22, 2025: [Service Executed]
  • April 04, 2025: [Service Executed]
March, 2025
  • March 25, 2025: [Remark re Pro Hac Vice Motion]
  • March 25, 2025: [Remark (Public) ]
  • March 14, 2025: [25 Pct Mag - Agreement to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction]
  • March 13, 2025: [Summons Issued]
  • March 12, 2025: [Summons Submitted]
  • March 11, 2025: [Summons Issued]
  • March 11, 2025: [New Case Opened]
  • March 11, 2025: [Summons Submitted]
  • March 11, 2025: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.