U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Arizona

arizona Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Arizona
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:23-cv-01610
  • Case Name: Long v. Lopez et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 01, 2025: [Notice of Change of Address/Email/Firm Name (Attorney)]
April, 2025
  • April 15, 2025: [Order]
  • April 15, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • April 14, 2025: [Summary Judgment]
  • April 14, 2025: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages ]
  • April 14, 2025: [Statement of Facts]
  • April 14, 2025: [Lodged Proposed Document]
  • April 14, 2025: [File Excess Pages]
  • April 09, 2025: [Notice of Service of Discovery]
March, 2025
  • March 20, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time ]
  • March 19, 2025: [Extension of Time]
  • March 12, 2025: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • March 11, 2025: [Appoint Counsel]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.