U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Arizona

arizona Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Arizona
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:25-cv-00363
  • Case Name: Ketron v. DAS Services LLC et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 09, 2025: [Extension of Time]
  • April 04, 2025: [Order]
March, 2025
  • March 28, 2025: [Answer to Complaint]
  • March 19, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time ]
  • March 13, 2025: [Summons Issued]
  • March 12, 2025: [Extension of Time]
  • March 12, 2025: [Summons Submitted]
  • March 11, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • March 11, 2025: [Order on Stipulation]
  • March 11, 2025: [Stipulation For Extension of Time To Answer Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.