U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Arizona

arizona Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Arizona
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:25-cv-00025
  • Case Name: Smith v. Tucson Unified School District et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Notice of Service of Discovery]
  • April 29, 2025: [Notice of Service of Discovery]
  • April 28, 2025: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • April 15, 2025: [Notice of Service of Discovery]
  • April 14, 2025: [Notice of Filing - Amended Pleading (LRCiv 15.1(b))]
  • April 11, 2025: [Notice of Deposition]
  • April 10, 2025: [Notice of Deposition]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Notice of Service of Discovery]
  • March 26, 2025: [Notice of Deposition]
  • March 25, 2025: [Notice of Service of Discovery]
  • March 19, 2025: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief ]
  • March 19, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 11, 2025: [Notice of Service of Discovery]
  • March 11, 2025: [Notice of Deposition]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.