U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Arizona

arizona Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Arizona
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:25-cv-00778
  • Case Name: Rafi Law Group PLLC v. Negrete et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 01, 2025: [Notice of Service of Discovery]
April, 2025
  • April 23, 2025: [Joinder]
  • April 21, 2025: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • April 14, 2025: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • April 14, 2025: [Notice of Appearance/Association of Counsel]
  • April 11, 2025: [Notice of Service of Discovery]
  • April 08, 2025: [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Dismiss Counts/Claims]
  • March 25, 2025: [Service Executed]
  • March 20, 2025: [Service Executed]
  • March 13, 2025: [Remark re Pro Hac Vice Motion]
  • March 12, 2025: [Order]
  • March 12, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 11, 2025: [Service Executed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.