U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Arizona

arizona Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Arizona
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:24-cv-00618
  • Case Name: Jones v. Asurint Incorporated et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: [Status Conference ]
  • April 29, 2025: [1 - Common Prompts (Text Only)]
  • April 29, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • April 23, 2025: [Remark re Pro Hac Vice Motion]
  • April 15, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Order on Stipulation]
  • March 27, 2025: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
  • March 18, 2025: [Notice of Deposition]
  • March 14, 2025: [Telephone Conference]
  • March 14, 2025: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • March 14, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery]
  • March 14, 2025: [1 - Common Prompts (Text Only)]
  • March 11, 2025: [Minute Order]
  • March 11, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.