U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Arizona

arizona Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Arizona
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:25-cv-08044
  • Case Name: Juarez et al v. Harding et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 24, 2025: [Notice of Deposition]
  • April 21, 2025: [Notice of Service of Discovery]
  • April 07, 2025: [Report - Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting (Proposed Case Mgt Plan)]
  • April 01, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
March, 2025
  • March 24, 2025: [Order]
  • March 24, 2025: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • March 19, 2025: [Remark (Public) ]
  • March 19, 2025: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • March 12, 2025: [Notice of Filing - Amended Pleading (LRCiv 15.1(b))]
  • March 12, 2025: [Notice of Deficiency (Text Only)]
  • March 11, 2025: [Amended Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.