U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Arizona

arizona Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Arizona
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:25-cv-08000
  • Case Name: Uldrikson v. State Farm Fire and Casualty Company et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 10, 2025: [Order on Stipulation]
  • April 10, 2025: [~Util - Set/Clear Flags ]
  • April 08, 2025: [Stipulation]
March, 2025
  • March 17, 2025: [Notice of Service of Discovery]
  • March 14, 2025: [Notice of Service of Discovery]
  • March 11, 2025: [Minute Order]
  • March 11, 2025: [~Util - Add and Terminate Parties]
  • March 11, 2025: [~Util - Terminate Deadlines]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.