U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Arizona

arizona Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Arizona
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:25-cv-00034
  • Case Name: Carrillo v. Pima Community College District
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 16, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 15, 2025: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • April 09, 2025: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • April 09, 2025: [Dismiss Case]
March, 2025
  • March 20, 2025: [Amended Complaint]
  • March 11, 2025: [Amended Complaint]
  • March 11, 2025: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.