U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Arizona

arizona Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Arizona
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:25-cv-00641--MTM
  • Case Name: Lorig #345970 v. Arizona Department of Corrections Rehabilitation and Reentry
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 18, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 11, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 08, 2025: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • April 07, 2025: [Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement]
March, 2025
  • March 19, 2025: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • March 19, 2025: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • March 11, 2025: [Appoint Counsel]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.