U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Arizona

arizona Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Arizona
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:24-cv-02457
  • Case Name: August Image LLC v. Esthetic Finesse LLC et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
March, 2025
  • March 17, 2025: [~Util - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • March 17, 2025: [Scheduling Order]
  • March 14, 2025: [Report - Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting (Proposed Case Mgt Plan)]
  • March 13, 2025: [Minute Order]
  • March 13, 2025: [~Util - Supplemental Request for Copyright, Trademark, or Patent Information]
  • March 12, 2025: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • March 11, 2025: [Notice of Filing - Copyright, Trademark or Patent Information]
  • March 11, 2025: [Minute Order]
  • March 11, 2025: [~Util - Supplemental Request for Copyright, Trademark, or Patent Information]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.