U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Arizona

arizona Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Arizona
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:25-cv-00241
  • Case Name: Stolarski v. Smith's Food & Drug Centers Incorporated
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Order]
  • April 30, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 30, 2025: [Scheduling Conference]
  • April 30, 2025: [1 - Common Prompts (Text Only)]
  • April 23, 2025: [Report - Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting (Proposed Case Mgt Plan)]
  • April 15, 2025: [Remark re Pro Hac Vice Motion]
March, 2025
  • March 28, 2025: [Order]
  • March 28, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 28, 2025: [Answer to Complaint]
  • March 14, 2025: [Amended Complaint]
  • March 12, 2025: [Order on Stipulation]
  • March 11, 2025: [Stipulation]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.