U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Arizona

arizona Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Arizona
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:23-cv-01367
  • Case Name: D'Agostino v. Abbott Laboratories Incorporated et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • April 27, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 23, 2025: [Reply]
  • April 21, 2025: [Lodged Proposed Document]
  • April 21, 2025: [Leave to File Document]
  • April 19, 2025: [Seal Document]
  • April 18, 2025: [Order]
  • April 18, 2025: [~Util - Terminate Motions ]
  • April 18, 2025: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • April 16, 2025: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • April 16, 2025: [Sanctions]
  • April 15, 2025: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • April 10, 2025: [Summons Issued]
  • April 10, 2025: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief ]
  • April 10, 2025: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • April 09, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 09, 2025: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief ]
  • April 09, 2025: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • April 08, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 08, 2025: [Transcript]
  • April 08, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 08, 2025: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief ]
  • April 08, 2025: [Order on Motion to Seal Document ]
  • April 08, 2025: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • April 07, 2025: [Additional Attachments to Main Document]
  • April 07, 2025: [Lodged Proposed Document]
  • April 07, 2025: [Seal Document]
  • April 07, 2025: [Protective Order]
  • April 07, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 04, 2025: [Transcript Request]
  • April 03, 2025: [Transcript Request]
  • April 03, 2025: [Status Conference ]
  • April 03, 2025: [1 - Common Prompts (Text Only)]
  • April 02, 2025: [Protective Order]
  • April 02, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time ]
  • April 02, 2025: [Sanctions]
  • April 02, 2025: [Response to Motion]
  • April 01, 2025: [Lodged Proposed Document]
  • April 01, 2025: [Seal Document]
  • April 01, 2025: [Reply to Response to Motion]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Extension of Time]
  • March 28, 2025: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
  • March 28, 2025: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • March 28, 2025: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief ]
  • March 28, 2025: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • March 28, 2025: [Order on Motion to Expedite ]
  • March 28, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time ]
  • March 28, 2025: [Order on Motion for Leave to File ]
  • March 27, 2025: [Continue]
  • March 27, 2025: [Response to Motion]
  • March 27, 2025: [Additional Attachments to Main Document]
  • March 27, 2025: [Leave to File Document]
  • March 26, 2025: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • March 25, 2025: [Expedite]
  • March 24, 2025: [Response]
  • March 23, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 21, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 21, 2025: [Reconsideration]
  • March 21, 2025: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief ]
  • March 21, 2025: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • March 18, 2025: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • March 17, 2025: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief ]
  • March 17, 2025: [Order]
  • March 17, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • March 14, 2025: [Order on Motion to Expedite ]
  • March 14, 2025: [Transcript]
  • March 14, 2025: [Expedite]
  • March 14, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 13, 2025: [Protective Order]
  • March 12, 2025: [Summons Issued]
  • March 12, 2025: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct ]
  • March 12, 2025: [Order on Motion to Expedite ]
  • March 11, 2025: [Expedite]
  • March 11, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.