U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Arizona

arizona Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Arizona
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:25-cv-00707
  • Case Name: Straker v. V.T. Motors LLC
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 17, 2025: [Disclosure Statement]
  • April 15, 2025: [Order]
  • April 15, 2025: [Notice of Deficiency re Disclosure Statement]
  • April 14, 2025: [Answer to Complaint]
March, 2025
  • March 26, 2025: [Order]
  • March 25, 2025: [Order on Stipulation]
  • March 25, 2025: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • March 25, 2025: [Stipulation For Extension of Time To Answer Complaint]
  • March 25, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance/Substitution - USA]
  • March 25, 2025: [Minute Order]
  • March 25, 2025: [~Util - Add and Terminate Judges]
  • March 25, 2025: [~Util - Terminate Hearings]
  • March 25, 2025: [25 Pct Mag - Election to Assign Case to District Judge]
  • March 24, 2025: [25 Pct Mag - Order to Show Cause (LRCiv 3.7(b))]
  • March 13, 2025: [Order]
  • March 11, 2025: [Service Executed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.