U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Arizona

arizona Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Arizona
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:24-cv-00049
  • Case Name: Rodriguez v. United States of America et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 28, 2025: [Notice of Service of Discovery]
  • April 22, 2025: [Order on Stipulation]
  • April 22, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • April 18, 2025: [Stipulation]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • March 31, 2025: [Protective Order]
  • March 27, 2025: [Notice of Deposition]
  • March 19, 2025: [Notice of Deposition]
  • March 11, 2025: [Notice of Service of Discovery]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.