U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Arizona

arizona Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Arizona
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:24-cv-08055
  • Case Name: Ideal Landscaping and Concrete LLC v. RS Security Consulting Limited et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 11, 2025: [Order Dismissing Case]
March, 2025
  • March 25, 2025: [Order]
  • March 25, 2025: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • March 24, 2025: [In-Court Hearing]
  • March 24, 2025: [~Util - Terminate Hearings]
  • March 24, 2025: [Notice of Settlement]
  • March 24, 2025: [Order]
  • March 21, 2025: [Order]
  • March 20, 2025: [Proposed Jury Instructions]
  • March 20, 2025: [Proposed Verdict Form]
  • March 20, 2025: [Statement of the Case]
  • March 19, 2025: [Order]
  • March 18, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • March 14, 2025: [Pretrial Conference - Final]
  • March 14, 2025: [1 - Common Prompts (Text Only)]
  • March 14, 2025: [Order]
  • March 13, 2025: [Order]
  • March 13, 2025: [Proposed Verdict Form]
  • March 12, 2025: [Proposed Verdict Form]
  • March 12, 2025: [Proposed Jury Instructions]
  • March 12, 2025: [Order]
  • March 10, 2025: [Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.