U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Arizona

arizona Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Arizona
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:25-cv-00731--DMF
  • Case Name: Flores v. Phoenix, City of et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 01, 2025: [Notice of Service of Discovery]
April, 2025
  • April 01, 2025: [Answer to Complaint]
March, 2025
  • March 19, 2025: [Stipulation For Extension of Time To Answer Complaint]
  • March 19, 2025: [Notice of Appearance/Association of Counsel]
  • March 17, 2025: [Demand for Jury Trial by Defendant]
  • March 11, 2025: [Service Executed]
  • March 10, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • March 10, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance/Substitution - USA]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.