U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Arizona

arizona Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Arizona
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:23-cv-01684
  • Case Name: JenMa Properties LLC v. JS Phoenix Holdings LLC et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • April 15, 2025: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
  • April 11, 2025: [Dismiss Case]
  • April 01, 2025: [Order]
  • April 01, 2025: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Report - Status]
  • March 18, 2025: [Status Conference ]
  • March 18, 2025: [1 - Common Prompts (Text Only)]
  • March 10, 2025: [Order]
  • March 10, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.