U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Arizona

arizona Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Arizona
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:23-cv-01778
  • Case Name: Green #076282 v. Hernandez et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: [Lodged Proposed Document]
  • April 29, 2025: [Leave to File Document]
  • April 25, 2025: [Response to Motion]
  • April 24, 2025: [Response to Motion]
  • April 21, 2025: [Appoint Counsel]
  • April 21, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • April 21, 2025: [Notice of Service of Discovery]
  • April 18, 2025: [Extension of Time]
  • April 09, 2025: [Response to Motion]
  • April 07, 2025: [Order]
  • April 07, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • April 04, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 04, 2025: [Stay]
March, 2025
  • March 12, 2025: [Order]
  • March 12, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • March 11, 2025: [Summary Judgment]
  • March 11, 2025: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages ]
  • March 11, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • March 10, 2025: [Notice of Change of Address (Party)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.