U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Arizona

arizona Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Arizona
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:24-cv-03414
  • Case Name: Fussell et al v. Sun Vista RV Resort LLC et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 01, 2025: [Order]
April, 2025
  • April 25, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • April 25, 2025: [Order]
  • April 25, 2025: [~Util - Terminate Motions ]
  • April 17, 2025: [Response to Motion]
  • April 15, 2025: [Memorandum ]
  • April 15, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 08, 2025: [Reply]
  • April 02, 2025: [Response to Motion]
  • April 01, 2025: [Strike]
March, 2025
  • March 25, 2025: [Response]
  • March 25, 2025: [Memorandum ]
  • March 25, 2025: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • March 21, 2025: [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • March 20, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • March 18, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • March 18, 2025: [Amended Complaint]
  • March 18, 2025: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • March 13, 2025: [Brief - Reply]
  • March 13, 2025: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • March 13, 2025: [Response]
  • March 13, 2025: [Response to Motion]
  • March 13, 2025: [Joinder]
  • March 13, 2025: [Notice of Appearance/Association of Counsel]
  • March 10, 2025: [Memorandum ]
  • March 10, 2025: [Affidavit]
  • March 10, 2025: [Application for Entry of Default]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.