U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Arizona

arizona Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Arizona
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:25-cv-00113--BGM
  • Case Name: Lopez-Echeverria v. Gutierrez
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: [Filing Fee Received]
  • April 22, 2025: [Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement]
  • April 22, 2025: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • April 09, 2025: [Order]
  • April 09, 2025: [~Util - Set/Clear Flags ]
  • April 09, 2025: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
March, 2025
  • March 21, 2025: [Mail Returned]
  • March 10, 2025: [Notice of Assignment]
  • March 10, 2025: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (Fed/2241)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.