U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Arizona

arizona Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Arizona
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:25-cv-00110--JR
  • Case Name: Carmona v. Bondi et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
March, 2025
  • March 21, 2025: [Order on Motion to Dismiss ]
  • March 21, 2025: [Dismiss Case]
  • March 20, 2025: [Order]
  • March 20, 2025: [~Util - Terminate Hearings]
  • March 19, 2025: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • March 12, 2025: [Summons Issued]
  • March 12, 2025: [Order on Motion for TRO ]
  • March 10, 2025: [Temporary Restraining Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.